Tuesday, February 26, 2008

Maths

Maths
Learn maths for free.
Maths : we are going to discuss the multiplication in maths most of them will be using calculator even for small mulitplication. I think you have landed what you are wondering for ? Welcome to Maths tricks. Here you can learn mental maths very easily. Let us go to the session.

Last session we had seen how to work with the digit 5. Now let us see how to with these types(22 X 28 ; 31 X 39) look carefully the last two digit in the second line is different but same number is in the first line now the sum of second line is 10 if you find any multiplication like this you can apply the same rule as in the previous session.

first multiply the numbers in the second line ie 2 X 8 = 16 then increment one of the first line digit ie 2+1=3 now multiply 3 X 2 =6 the answer for above said is 616 verify it with your calculator.

see the second example is 31 X 39

the sum of second line is 10 first multiply the numbers in the second line ie1 X 9 = 09 then increment one of the first line digit ie 3+1=4 now multiply 4 X 3 = 12 the answer for 1209 verify with your calculator.

Now try this by your own
12 X 18 ; 13 X 17 ; 14 X 16 ; 24 X 26 ; 21 X 29 ; 101 X 109 ; 87 X 83
see soon with next update.

1 comment:

nalin said...

well said my friend, your tricks are good and they deserve some comment.
you are out standing, keep on posting some more tips.
you can exchange your blog link with me